skip to content

Scroggie, David Gordon

CPSO#: 21126

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 18 Cornish Rd Toronto ON M4T 2E2
Date Received: 24 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019