skip to content

Scott, Anthony Frederick Christian

CPSO#: 19478

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996