skip to content

Scott, Andrea Dianne

CPSO#: 92204

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University College, Cork, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 23 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011