skip to content

Scobie, Thomas Keith

CPSO#: 15102

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 17-Aug-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1955 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1987