skip to content

Schwartz, Roslyn Taube

CPSO#: 31847

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1982

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
171 College Street
Kingston ON  K7L 4L9
Phone: (613) 548-4396
Fax: (613) 548-8011 Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROSLYN TAUBE SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1982