skip to content

Schwartz, Lisa Catherine

CPSO#: 94838

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:City Univ N Y Mount Sinai School of Med, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lisa Catherine Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Feb 2012
CF - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016