skip to content

Schwartz, Amanda Eva

CPSO#: 88632

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416)242-1000 Ext. 48000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amanda Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schwartz ( CPSO# 88632 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDA EVA SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2014