skip to content

Schutz, Hartmut

CPSO#: 19375

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Sherway Drive
3rd Floor
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 259-7580 Ext. 5824
Fax: (416) 521-4140 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Schutz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 6 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Tippets Records 106 Ridgetop Rd Scarborough M1P 2J9
Date Received: 10 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019