Schulein, Simone (CPSO#: 99335)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2013 to 15 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2014