skip to content

Schuenemann, Holger Jens

CPSO#: 91933

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice as of 29 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Italian

Education:Hanover Medical School, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
HSC Area 2C
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 24931 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Schuenemann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOLGER JENS SCHUENEMANN may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. SCHUENEMANN holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. SCHUENEMANN may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SCHUENEMANN no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. SCHUENEMANN no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. SCHUENEMANN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Jan 2012