skip to content

Schram, Carrie Ann

CPSO#: 88631

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hannam Fertility Centre
160 Bloor St E, Unit 15
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2
Phone: (416) 595-1521
Fax: 416-506-0680 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M6S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6060 Ext. 1,3
Fax: 416-323-6332
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carrie Schram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Schram ( CPSO# 88631 )

Business Address:
Hannam Fertility Centre
15th Floor
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2
Phone Number: (416) 595-1521

Business Address:
Womens College Hospital
4th Floor
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARRIE ANN SCHRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHRAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010