skip to content

Schneider, Raphael Peter

CPSO#: 95592

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Albert Ludwig Univ at Freiburg, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Neurology
9-Donnelly
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5377 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Raphael Schneider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Schneider ( CPSO# 95592 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
9 - Donnelly
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:29 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAPHAEL PETER SCHNEIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 30 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2018