Schnarr, Kara Lynne (CPSO#: 96153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V5C2
Phone: 9053879495
Fax: 9055756326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schnarr Drossos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Schnarr ( CPSO# 96153 )
Dr. A. Drossos ( CPSO# 98807 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care Hamilton
Department of Psychiatry and Behavioural Neuroscie
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 12 Mar 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARA LYNNE SCHNARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNARR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2016 to 12 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2017