skip to content

Schmitt-Opitz, Isabelle Annemarie Beatrix

CPSO#: 94729

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cologne, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 07 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011