skip to content

Schmidt, Rebecca Prasad

CPSO#: 92881

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University PGCLL 210/201
1280 Main Street West L8S 4K1
Hamilton ON  L8S 4S4
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 27700
Fax: 905-546-0805 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sadhana Prasad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 8 2021
Corporation Name: Lysecki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lysecki ( CPSO# 92826 )
Dr. R. Schmidt ( CPSO# 92881 )

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
McMaster University PGCLL 210/201
Hamilton ON  L8S 4S4
Phone Number: 905-525-9140

Business Address:
303-3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: 905-681-6042

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA PRASAD SCHMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMIDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012