skip to content

Schmidt, Michael David

CPSO#: 93758

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON  N4K 5N3
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schmidt ( CPSO# 93758 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9

Business Address:
1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 722-8036

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID SCHMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMIDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2016