skip to content

Schmalfuss, Peter Ernst Hans

CPSO#: 20570

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: (800) 775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 25 Aug 2011


Instructions: Patients can leave a voicemail message at (416) 256-7850 and Dr. Schmalfuss's assistant will make the appropriate arrangements.
Date Received: 16 Aug 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1966
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2014

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 30, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Schmalfuss has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario of any other jurisdiction.