skip to content

Schlenker, Matthew Bryan

CPSO#: 93166

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
EW 6-405
399 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5727 Ext. eFax-Schle
Fax: (416) 603-5682 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2201 Bristol Circle, Suite 100
Oakville ON  L6H 0J8
Canada
Phone: 905-820-3937
Fax: 905-459-5085
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Kensington Vision & Research Centre
Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: 416-928-1335
Fax: 416-928-5075
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Matthew Bryan Schlenker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schlenker ( CPSO# 93166 )

Business Address:
Prism Eye Institute Mississauga
100 - 2201 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 0J8
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8

Business Address:
Kensington Vision & Research Centre
Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-1335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW BRYAN SCHLENKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHLENKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015