skip to content

Scherling, Nicole Danielle

CPSO#: 97878

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Tapiola Crescent
2nd Floor
Ottawa ON  K1T 2J7
Phone: 613-738-0303
Fax: 613-738-8950 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLE DANIELLE SCHERLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHERLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014