skip to content

Scher, Kim Eric

CPSO#: 85889

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jan 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone: (905) 871-1220
Fax: (905) 871-1221 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018
Corporation Name: Kim E. Scher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Scher ( CPSO# 85889 )

Business Address:
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-1220


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIM ERIC SCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2019