skip to content

Schenker, Carly Shifra

CPSO#: 112238

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
440 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Toronto ON  M5T 2S6
Phone: 4166035888 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CARLY SHIFRA SCHENKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHENKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2019