skip to content

Scheer, Adena Sarah

CPSO#: 85012

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St. Rm 3-005 Donnelly Wing
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5804
Fax: (416) 864-5821 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adena Sarah Scheer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Scheer ( CPSO# 85012 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 3-005 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5804

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADENA SARAH SCHEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012