skip to content

Schecter, Danial Marvin Isak

CPSO#: 89519

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105-11 Lakeside Terr
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 888-282-7763
Fax: 844-320-9652 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 Georgian Drive
Barrie
Ontario
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Cadence Health Centre
200 Spadina Ave
Toronto ON  M5T 2C2
Canada
Phone: 416-203-8600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Schecter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schecter ( CPSO# 89519 )

Business Address:
Cannabinoid Medical Clinic
Suite 407
1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone Number: (888) 282-7763

Business Address:
200 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 203-8600

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIAL MARVIN ISAK SCHECTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHECTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010