skip to content

Schappert, Andrew David

CPSO#: 100702

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Schappert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schappert ( CPSO# 100702)

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Emergency of Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID SCHAPPERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHAPPERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018