skip to content

Schaffer, Stephen Allan

CPSO#: 90347

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 14 Apr 2009 to 06 May 2009
EL - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013