skip to content

Schachter, Sam Sheldon

CPSO#: 28580

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 James Street
Milton ON  L9T 2P3
Phone: (905) 878-1923
Fax: (905) 878-4620 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAM SHELDON SCHACHTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHACHTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2019