skip to content

Schachter, Sam Sheldon

CPSO#: 28580

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Apr 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
434 Gowland Crescent
Milton ON  L9T 4E4
Phone: 9058757167 Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Dr. Justin McNish - he is practicing at a new location - 470 Bronte St S #110, Milton On L9T 2J4 and his phone number is 905 878 1923 - fax 905 878 4620. He has possession of all my medical records.
Date Received: 02 Feb 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2021