skip to content

Schabas, Richard Elliot

CPSO#: 29254

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Mar 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 213-360 Bloor Street East Toronto ON M4W 3M3
Date Received: 24 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 2017