skip to content

Scatliff, Robert Matthew

CPSO#: 94291

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Scatliff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT MATTHEW SCATLIFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCATLIFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2020