skip to content

Scaranelo, Anabel Medeiros

CPSO#: 85761

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Dec 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Estadual de Londrina, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
Room 3-922
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4833
Fax: (416) 946-6564 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Marvelle Koffler Breast Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416 586-4800 Ext. 8751
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Corporation Name: Scaranelo & Santos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011
Corporation Name: Scaranelo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Scaranelo ( CPSO# 85761 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
610 University Avenue
Room 3-922
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 945-4601


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Brazil
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:20 Dec 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 16 Jan 2007 to 10 Nov 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 11 Nov 2007 to 14 Dec 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2015 Active
 Dr. Anabel Medeiros Scaranelo may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.