skip to content

Sbrocchi, Anne Marie

CPSO#: 87670

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 03 Sep 2007 to 29 Sep 2007
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011