skip to content

Sayyid, Rashid

CPSO#: 136556

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2022
EXPIRY DATE
18 Jan 2027
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 19 Jan 2024

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education: American University of Beirut Faculty of, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 4163404800 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 4169462000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 4166032581
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 4165964200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 4164806100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:19 Jan 2024 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2024
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 18 Jan 2027

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jan 2024 Active
 1. Dr. RASHID SAYYID may practise urology at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) University Health Network - Toronto General Hospital in Toronto, Ontario; 

(ii) University Health Network - princess Margaret Cancer Centre in Toronto, Ontario;

(iii) University Health Network - Toronto Western Hospital in Toronto, Ontario;

(iv) Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre in Toronto, Ontario; and

(v) Mount Sinai Hospital in Toronto, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SAYYID's eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.
 
3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. SAYYID's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. SAYYID's practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 January, 2024, and will expire on or before 18 January, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.