skip to content

Sayedi Roshkhar, Sayedhadi

CPSO#: 89520

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College BLVD
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-494-2120 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital, Birchmoun
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: 416-495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital - General
3050 Lawrence ave East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416-438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East, Brampton
Toronto ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 9054942120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

381 Church street
Markham Stouffville hospital
Toronto ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

700 Ross Ave, Timmis ON
Timmins and districts hospital
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: 705-267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sayedi Roshkhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sayedi Roshkhar ( CPSO# 89520 )

Business Address:
115 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9V 0A9
Phone Number: (416) 741-3460

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Street
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAYEDHADI SAYEDI ROSHKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYEDI ROSHKHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 19 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014