skip to content

Sayani, Eshratbanu

CPSO#: 32187

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
1262 Don Mills Rd
North York ON  M3B2W7
Phone: (416) 447-4147
Fax: (437) 317-9609 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E. Sayani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sayani ( CPSO# 32187 )

Business Address:
108 - 170 The Donway West
North York ON  M3C 2G3
Phone Number: (647) 347-6300

Business Address:
17 Treadgold Cres
North York ON  M3A 1X1
Phone Number: 4167564605

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 310 1920 Ellesmere Road Scarborough ON M1H 2V6 Tel: 647-350-0550 Fax: 647-350-0552
Date Received: 03 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ESHRATBANU SAYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1981