Saxena, Puja (CPSO#: 96948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: Chakerwarti, Puja (used until: 06 Feb 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PUJA SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2018