skip to content

Sawchuk, Michael Alexander

CPSO#: 97657

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Sep 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-748-4958
Fax: 613-907-8003 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

509 Bathurst Ave
Ottawa ON  K1G 0X4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

713 Montreal Rd
Phone: 613-746-4621
Fax: 613-907-8003
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sawchuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sawchuk ( CPSO# 97657 )

Business Address:
200 Eglantine Driveway
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone Number: (613) 957-2991


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALEXANDER SAWCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWCHUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2017