Sawa, Kathryn (CPSO#: 98594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone: 519-740-2000
Fax: 519-740-2003
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Sawa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sawa ( CPSO# 98594 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 967-8500

Business Address:
203 - 745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN SAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 01 Oct 2018
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2017