skip to content

Sawa, Gordon Michael John

CPSO#: 28061

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Feb 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For charts of patients seen prior to 2013, and any third party reports irrespective of when the patient was seen, requests must be emailed to: [email protected] The request should include their contact info, and reference Account # KTB020997. For charts only, patients from 2013 onwards may contact Trillium Health Partners at 905-848-7181 or send an email to [email protected]
Date Received: 19 Aug 2020


Instructions: Patients prior to 2013 must email a request to: [email protected] The request should include their contact info, and reference Account # KTB020997. Patients from 2013 onwards may contact Trillium Health Partners at 905-848-7181 or send an email to [email protected]
Date Received: 14 Apr 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:29 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GORDON MICHAEL JOHN SAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1976