skip to content

Sauve, Raylene Sherren

CPSO#: 91004

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 668-7297 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
1910 StLaurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Department of Anesthesia
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Canada
Phone: (613)668-7297
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Raylene Sauve Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sauve ( CPSO# 91004 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5W5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Business Address:
1910 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAYLENE SHERREN SAUVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014