skip to content

Saunoris, Algimantas

CPSO#: 30573

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jun 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 6-Jan-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Lithuanian, Polish, Russian

Education:Vilnius State University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 2011

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 15, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective April 15, 2011, Dr. Saunoris has resigned from the College and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.