skip to content

Saunders, Fraser Worden

CPSO#: 30238

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3696 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Fraser Saunders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Saunders ( CPSO# 30238 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 544-1284

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:27 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FRASER WORDEN SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1978