skip to content

Saunders, Brooke

CPSO#: 97735

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Saunders, Brooke Rachel (used until: 10 Jun 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-338-4690 Ext. 4605 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Eglinton Ave E
suite 604
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. Saunders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Saunders ( CPSO# 97735 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
604 - 1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BROOKE SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 28 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
EL - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015