skip to content

Saund, Gagandeep Kaur

CPSO#: 84828

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G.K. Saund Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Saund ( CPSO# 84828 )

Business Address:
55 Dusk Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Phone Number: (905) 451-9999

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAGANDEEP KAUR SAUND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010