skip to content

Sauder, Maxwell Benjamin

CPSO#: 95053

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Dermatology Centre
400 - 4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone: (416) 633-0001
Fax: (416) 633-0002 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto ON  M5G 2C1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAXWELL BENJAMIN SAUDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2017