skip to content

Sator-Kulic, Zehra Mustafa

CPSO#: 28605

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Sarajevo, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006