skip to content

Satkunasingham, Janakan

CPSO#: 92915

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Center
711 Concession Street
Hamilton, Ontario
L8V 1C3
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-389-4411
Fax: 905-575-2600 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Janakan Satkunasingham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Satkunasingham ( CPSO# 92915 )

Business Address:
103 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-2066

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 662-3885

Business Address:
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3

Business Address:
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital & Care Center
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANAKAN SATKUNASINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATKUNASINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2016