skip to content

Sarti, Aimee June

CPSO#: 84772

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: Peuhkuri, Aimee June (used until: 06 Nov 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Critical Care
The Ottawa Hospital /
University of Ottawa
Box 207, 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Fax: (613) 737-8890 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sarti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sarti ( CPSO# 84772 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Critical Care
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jan 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AIMEE JUNE SARTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2008 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2011