skip to content

Sarraf, Morad Kalimi

CPSO#: 21856

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Apr 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records up to 2011: 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 888 563 3732 Records from 2012-2016: Albionthistle Town Medical Centre Suite A2 900 Albion Road Toronto, ON M9V 1A5 Tel: 416 740 7272
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018