Sarne, Andrew John (CPSO#: 21071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 1967

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Comprehensive Healthcare Network
Beaches Medical Clinic
116 Glen Manor Drive
Toronto, Ontario M4E 2X2
Toronto ON  M4E 2X2
Phone: 416-698-0999
Fax: 416-698-0577
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sarne ( CPSO# 21071 )

Business Address:
2077 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Etobicoke ON  M8V 0A2
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 08 Apr 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 29 May 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN SARNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARNE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Mar 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1967