skip to content

Sarkaria, Gagandeep Singh

CPSO#: 87760

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Medical University of Debrecen, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
911 Queen Street
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6425
Fax: 519 749-6498 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Westmount
Guelph ON  N0B 2B0
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

69 Huron Street
Guelph ON  N1E 5L5
Canada
Phone: 18558496228
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gagandeep Sarkaria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sarkaria ( CPSO# 87760 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Street Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6425

Business Address:
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone Number: (519) 824-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:31 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAGANDEEP SINGH SARKARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARKARIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2009